+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-127
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 349
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 278
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 188
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 447 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
April 10, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 31
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (23)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor