+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 293
- File Number 500
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/14
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor