+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 265
- House Calendar Number 198
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
+ − Vote
March 20, 2018: BA Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Banking Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor