+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 582
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 630
- House Calendar Number 400
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
May 6, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 259
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (21)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor