+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 422
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 244
- File Number 409
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 16, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 63
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor