+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 285
- File Number 395
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/22 12:00 PM
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 17, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/21
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsor
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor