+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 16, 2022 in the House:
- Public Act 22-117
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 537
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5729
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 601
- House Calendar Number 463
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/21
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor