+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 571
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 3, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5242
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 255
- House Calendar Number 162
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
May 3, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 237 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (34)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor