+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Act 16-9
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- File Number 701
- Senate Calendar Number 442
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3975
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 356
- House Calendar Number 250
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/16 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/02
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Education
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: Senate Roll Call Vote 388
- Yeas: 36
April 19, 2016: House Roll Call Vote 46 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10