+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-81
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 498
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 469
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 277
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 346 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 130
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 22
+ − Sponsors (2)
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor