+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 649
On April 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 428
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3552
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 215
- File Number 353
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
April 16, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 50 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 141
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor