+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-159
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 726
- Senate Calendar Number 528
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4493
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 305
- House Calendar Number 185
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 424 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 149 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (15)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor