+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-156
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 468
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 549
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 360
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 379 PASS
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 412 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 23, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 90
- Yeas: 124
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor