+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 743
- Senate Calendar Number 556
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4826
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 628
- House Calendar Number 398
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 197 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 9