+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Special Act 22-13
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 572
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Passed
- In Concurrence
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 234
- House Calendar Number 199
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/22 5:00 PM
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor