+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-160
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 686
- Senate Calendar Number 456
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4091
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 397
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 627
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 407 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 23, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 96 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (16)
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor