+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Act 18-17
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 668
- Senate Calendar Number 471
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4452
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 372
- House Calendar Number 246
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/20
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
March 27, 2018: CE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor