+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 257
- File Number 399
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/10
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor