+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Passed Temporarily
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- File Number 487
- House Calendar Number 328
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/17 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/22
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2017: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 8
March 6, 2017: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
January 27, 2017: GAE Vote Tally Sheet
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor