+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 549
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 337
- File Number 530
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/10
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Vote
May 1, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 202
- Yeas: 120
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (21)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor