+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 242
- File Number 407
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor