+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 601
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 81
- House Calendar Number 71
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor