+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-190
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5617
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 600
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- In Concurrence
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 180
- File Number 300
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 297 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 52
- Absent: 7
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 457 PASS
- Yeas: 36
+ − Sponsors (3)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor