+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 274
- File Number 466
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (4)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor