+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-152
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 648
On April 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 417
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3751
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 209
- File Number 347
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/14 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 396 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 16, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 55 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor