+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 497
- House Calendar Number 340
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Vote
March 28, 2018: JUD Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor