+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 25, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act 18-116
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 310
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 252
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 185
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
+ − Vote
March 20, 2018: BA Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Banking Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor