+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Sponsors (3)
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor