+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- Public Act 22-26
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- File Number 675
- Senate Calendar Number 506
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5505
On April 22, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 508
- House Calendar Number 350
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor