+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 654
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 454
- House Calendar Number 283
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 10:00 AM
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
June 3, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 345
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor