+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- House Calendar Number 186
- File Number 276
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/13 10:00 AM
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Banks Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor