+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-34
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 640
- Senate Calendar Number 468
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5978
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Calendar Number 336
- File Number 526
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/19
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 328 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 24, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 62 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (34)
Select Committee on Veterans Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor