+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 74
- File Number 96
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Sponsors (5)
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor