+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act 18-8
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- File Number 644
- Senate Calendar Number 383
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3879
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 196
- House Calendar Number 155
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Vote
March 20, 2018: LAB Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor