+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 529
- File Number 725
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4440
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 258
- File Number 442
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 159 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (6)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor