+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 415
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 495
- House Calendar Number 349
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor