+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- No Action
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 494
- House Calendar Number 348
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor