+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- Public Act 22-63
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 375
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- File Number 207
- House Calendar Number 189
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
+ − Sponsor
Veterans' Affairs Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor