+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Education
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: HED Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor