+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Act 14-12
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 530
- File Number 723
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4403
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 132
- File Number 204
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 10:00 AM
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 352 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 141 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 139
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (10)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor