+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Act 14-11
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- File Number 722
- Senate Calendar Number 515
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3329
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 671
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/14 5:00 PM
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 249
- House Calendar Number 156
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 349 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
April 28, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 146 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (4)
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor