+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 155
- File Number 248
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor