+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 01/29
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor