+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- File Number 77
- House Calendar Number 91
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
March 14, 2018: ENV Vote Tally Sheet
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor