+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Motion Failed MF
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- File Number 158
- House Calendar Number 117
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsors (27)
Committee on Children
Type:
Primary Sponsor