+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 397
- House Calendar Number 255
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/15 5:00 PM
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/03
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor