+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- File Number 485
- House Calendar Number 306
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/29
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations