+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-88
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7601
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 700
- Senate Calendar Number 504
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6159
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 160
- House Calendar Number 123
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/21
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 285 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 6
May 22, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 363 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 71 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (40)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor