+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-146
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 334
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 92
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 70
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/03
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 390 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 9, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 27
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (6)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor