+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act 14-145
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On April 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 474
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 177
- File Number 297
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/06
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 7, 2014: Senate Roll Call Vote 415 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 23, 2014: House Roll Call Vote 88
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (25)
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor